RenewalMD, PC v. Shanklin
Plaintiff: RenewalMD, PC
Defendant: MD Joel Shanklin and Joel Shanklin
Case Number: 4:2021cv00184
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release, Verified Complaint, Verification, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 26 Instruction Order, Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution and Case Management Procedures, Motion to Seal Exhibit to Verified Complaint, Order, Not Executed Summons in a Civil Action, Executed Summons in a Civil Action, Notice of Manual Filing and Exhibit served on Joel Shanklin, M.D. on July 20, 2021, filed by RenewalMD, PC. (Bradley, Lucas)
July 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joel Shanklin answer due 8/10/2021. (thb)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Manual Filing by RenewalMD, PC re #1 Complaint Exhibit 1 (Bradley, Lucas)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting RenewalMD's #3 Motion to Seal Document. However, Shanklin is entitled to access it, and the Clerk is directed to make a copy available to him upon his appearance in the case, and should Shanklin object to this sealing, he is directed to file his objection within 14 days from his initial appearance in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/29/2021. (ca) Modified on 6/29/2021 (JH).
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joel Shanklin. (thb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Bradley, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by RenewalMD, PC. (Bradley, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint Motion to Seal Exhibit to Verified Complaint by RenewalMD, PC. Responses due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Seal Document re #1 Complaint. (thb)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/21/2021. (ca)
June 21, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joel Shanklin, filed by RenewalMD, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Agreement, #3 Verification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
June 18, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AGASDC-3129933. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RenewalMD, PC v. Shanklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RenewalMD, PC
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Joel Shanklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Shanklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?