Plant Riverside, LLC et al v. Hunt Construction Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Plant Riverside, LLC and Kessler Condo Declarant, LLC.
Defendant: Hunt Construction Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00235
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel J. Rhiner Receipt Number AGASDC-3206374, Fee Amount $200, by Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2021. (Conner, D.)
October 14, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel J. Rhiner Receipt Number AGASDC-3206374, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro-hac by Peter J. Bedard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/8/21. (cmr)
October 7, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. Amendment to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter J. Bedard Receipt Number AGASDC-3201867, Fee Amount $200,, #19 Notice of Filing,, Set/Reset Deadlines, . (Conner, D.)
October 7, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter J. Bedard Receipt Number AGASDC-3201867, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter J. Bedard. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/20/2021. (thb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter J. Bedard Receipt Number AGASDC-3201867, Fee Amount $200, by Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. Responses due by 10/20/2021. (Conner, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2021: #1 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb).
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant by Kessler Condo Declarant, LLC., Plant Riverside, LLC.(Phillips, Christopher)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Marshall Kutchey, III on behalf of All Defendants (Kutchey, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. (Kutchey, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Hunt Construction Group, Inc. (Kutchey, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM by Hunt Construction Group, Inc. against All Plaintiffs by Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 Historic Structure Contract, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 Three Muses Contract, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 West Hotel Contract, #4 Exhibit Exh 4 Parking Garage Contract, #5 Exhibit Exh 5 Notice of Claim of Lien Historic Structure, #6 Exhibit Exh 6 Certified Letter with Historic Structure Lien, #7 Exhibit Exh 7 Notice of Claim of Lien Three Muses Hotel, #8 Exhibit Exh 8 Certified Letter with Three Muses Lien, #9 Exhibit Exh 9A Historic Structure Contract Pay App 56, #10 Exhibit Exh 9B Three Muses Contract Pay App 56, #11 Exhibit Exh 9C West Hotel Contract Pay App 56, #12 Exhibit Exh 9D Parking Garage Contract Pay App 56)(Kutchey, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for D. Bryan Thomas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/27/21. (loh)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James F. Archibald, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/27/21. (loh)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joel G. Pieper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/24/2021. (ca)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons for Hunt Construction Group, Inc., Complaint, Litigant's Bill of Rights, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Rule 26(f) Order and Civil Cover Sheet served on Linda Banks on August 23, 2021, filed by Plant Riverside, LLC. (Phillips, Christopher)
August 24, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James F. Archibald, III, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice D. Bryan Thomas. (slt)
August 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hunt Construction Group, Inc. answer due 9/13/2021. (slt)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joel G. Pieper Receipt Number AGASDC-3171109, Fee Amount $200, by Plant Riverside, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - USDC - ND, #2 Exhibit List of Cases, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Phillips, Christopher)
August 23, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joel G. Pieper. (slt)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice D. Bryan Thomas Receipt Number AGASDC-3169206, Fee Amount $200, by Plant Riverside, LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate regarding Prior Cases -, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - U.S.D.C. - Middle District or Tennessee, #3 Exhibit Order of Admissions)(Phillips, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James F. Archibald, III Receipt Number AGASDC-3169137, Fee Amount $200, by Plant Riverside, LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate regarding Prior Cases, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing -State of Alabama, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing -USDC - Alabama, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice)(Phillips, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Plant Riverside, LLC. (Phillips, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Plant Riverside, LLC. (Phillips, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hunt Construction Group, Inc. (csr)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/18/2021. (csr)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hunt Construction Group, Inc., filed by Plant Riverside, LLC, and Kessler Condo Declarant, LLC. $402.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: AGASDC-3167984. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hunt Interim Waiver - Historical, #2 Exhibit Hunt Interim Waiver - Three Muses-Riverwalk, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)
August 18, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plant Riverside, LLC et al v. Hunt Construction Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plant Riverside, LLC
Represented By: Christopher W. Phillips
Represented By: Joel G. Pieper
Represented By: D. Bryan Thomas
Represented By: James F. Archibald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kessler Condo Declarant, LLC.
Represented By: Christopher W. Phillips
Represented By: Joel G. Pieper
Represented By: D. Bryan Thomas
Represented By: James F. Archibald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Construction Group, Inc.
Represented By: D. Michael Conner
Represented By: Peter Bedard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?