Williams v. City of Savannah et al
Plaintiff: Malik Ja'relle Williams
Defendant: City of Savannah, City of Pooler and City of Port Wentworth
Case Number: 4:2021cv00272
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to City of Pooler, City of Port Wentworth, and City of Savannah. (csr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing by Malik Ja'relle Williams re #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (loh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Malik Ja'relle Williams. (pts)
October 29, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (thb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by City of Pooler, City of Port Wentworth, City of Savannah. (Bonner, Joy)
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery by City of Pooler, City of Port Wentworth, City of Savannah. Responses due by 11/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay Discovery)(Bonner, Joy)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Filing filed by Malik Ja'relle Williams, #7 Notice of Filing filed by Malik Ja'relle Williams filed by City of Pooler, City of Port Wentworth, City of Savannah. (O'Connor, Patrick)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Pooler, City of Port Wentworth, City of Savannah. Responses due by 11/9/2021. (O'Connor, Patrick)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel by Malik Ja'relle Williams. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(gmh)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Malik Ja'relle Williams. (gmh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Signature Page by Malik Ja'relle Williams re #5 Notice of Filing. (loh)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #5 Notice of Filing. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (loh) Modified on 10/15/2021 (thb).
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Malik Ja'relle Williams re #1 Complaint. (loh)
October 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/29/2021. (loh)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (thb)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 09/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights) (thb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Pooler, City of Port Wentworth, City of Savannah, filed by Malik Ja'relle Williams. (Attachments: #1 Filing fee receipt)(wwp)
September 27, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number BWK011151. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Savannah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Ja'relle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Savannah
Represented By: Joy D. Bonner
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pooler
Represented By: Joy D. Bonner
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Port Wentworth
Represented By: Joy D. Bonner
Represented By: Patrick T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?