CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Seagate Handling, Inc.
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Seagate Handling, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00273
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Seagate Handling, Inc.. (Shelton, Martin)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Seagate Handling, Inc..(Shelton, Martin)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendant Seagate Handling, Inc. answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/21/2021. (jlh)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Seagate Handling, Inc.. Responses due by 11/3/2021. (Shelton, Martin)
October 20, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (thb)
October 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Seagate Handling, Inc. answer due 10/22/2021. (thb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Seagate Handling, Inc. c/o Edwin W. King, Jr., Esq. on 10/01/2021, filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Eckerson, Bridgette)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/28/2021. (pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2021: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (JH).
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Seagate Handling, Inc. (pts)
September 28, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (pts)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by CSX Transportation, Inc. (pts)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seagate Handling, Inc., filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(pts)
September 27, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3195265. (pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Seagate Handling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Bridgette Eckerson
Represented By: John L. McKinley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seagate Handling, Inc.
Represented By: Martin Arthur Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?