SIRECI v. JONES
Petitioner: JACOB NATHANIAL SIRECI
Respondent: WARDEN DESHAWN JONES
Not Classified By Court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00305
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (loh)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Transfer of Action re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (loh)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:21-cv-00353. Case transferred electronically
October 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: IFP due by 11/5/2021. (loh)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/7/2021. (kat)
October 7, 2021 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 10/21/2021. (tam)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JACOB SIRECI (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by JACOB SIRECI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Two pages of the Habeas Corpus filed in Superior Court of Muscogee County, #2 Envelope)(tam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIRECI v. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JACOB NATHANIAL SIRECI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN DESHAWN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?