Grant v. Todd
Plaintiff: Louis O'Neil Grant
Defendant: Lieteunant Todd and Lieutenant Todd
Case Number: 4:2021cv00325
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender. - No longer at this address. #8 R&R dated 12/7/2021. Mail sent to Louis O'Neil Grant. (csr)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to provide the Court with an updated address and failure to prosecute this action. Objections to R&R due by 12/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/7/2021. (kjm)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - VACANT, UNABLE TO FORWARD. Mail #4 Notice sent to Louis O'Neil Grant. (kjm)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Order. No longer at this address. Mail sent to Louis Oneil Grant. (ca)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on November 22, 2021. (jrb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Order re Magistrate Assignment. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement Regarding Assignment)(thb) Modified on 11/22/2021 (thb).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Todd. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 11/22/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/8/2021. (ca)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Louis O'Neil Grant. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(ca)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Todd, filed by Louis O'Neil Grant.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis O'Neil Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieteunant Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?