Nails v. Hilliard et al
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Defendant: Carey Hilliard and Three Carey Hilliard Employees
Case Number: 4:2021cv00364
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Angela Nails. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend her #1 Complaint and supplement her pending #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis within 14 days of this Order. (Compliance due by 2/24/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 02/10/2022. (Attachment: #1 IFP Long Form.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2022: #2 Entered in Error, #3 IFP Long Form Corrected) (jlh). Modified on 2/10/2022 (jlh).
February 10, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance with Order #6 due by 2/24/2022. (slt)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's unilateral #4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Clerk of Court is Directed to Administratively Terminate Plaintiff's unilateral Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/24/2022. (ca)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, by Angela Nails. (jlh)
January 19, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/27/2021. (jlh)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Angela Nails. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Angela Nails. (jlh)
December 27, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nails v. Hilliard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Carey Hilliard Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?