Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AH00000154-01 v. Edenfield et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AH00000154-01
Defendant: Cheryl Edenfield, Sadie Edwards and Catherine Moore
Case Number: 4:2022cv00035
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Dean Whatling on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AH00000154-01 (Whatling, Lee)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AH00000154-01. Cheryl Edenfield waiver sent on 2/15/2022, answer due 4/16/2022; Sadie Edwards waiver sent on 2/15/2022, answer due 4/16/2022; Catherine Moore waiver sent on 2/15/2022, answer due 4/16/2022. (Savrin, Philip)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/7/2022. (ca)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AH00000154-01. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Edenfield Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Edenfield Demand, #3 Exhibit C - Edward Demand, #4 Exhibit D - Moore Demand, #5 Exhibit E - Edenfield Disclaimer, #6 Exhibit F - Edwards Disclaimer, #7 Exhibit G - Moore Disclaimer, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Judgment and Demand, #9 Exhibit I - Policy, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
February 4, 2022 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3279670. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AH00000154-01 v. Edenfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AH00000154-01
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Represented By: Lee Dean Whatling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Edenfield
Represented By: Johnathan C. Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie Edwards
Represented By: Johnathan C. Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Moore
Represented By: Johnathan C. Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?