Alvarez v. Iron Workers Union Local 709 et al
Plaintiff: Luis Omar Alvarez
Defendant: Iron Workers Union Local 709, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Mr. Eric Dean, Mr. William McMillan, Mr. Derrick Sample and United States Department of Labor
Case Number: 4:2022cv00087
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing as moot Defendants' #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 06/09/2022. (jlh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Eric Dean, Iron Workers Union Local 709, William McMillan, Derrick Sample. Responses due by 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Tessa)
June 8, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (thb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Omar Alvarez. United States Department of Labor served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (gmh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Omar Alvarez. International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers waiver sent on 5/31/2022, answer due 7/30/2022. (gmh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2022: #1 Corrected pdf) (gmh).
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Omar Alvarez. Eric Dean waiver sent on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022; Iron Workers Union Local 709 waiver sent on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022; William McMillan waiver sent on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022; Derrick Sample waiver sent on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (jlh)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Enforce Payment of Service of Process Immediately After Service has been Perfected, by Luis Omar Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing civil cover sheet filed by Luis Omar Alvarez re: #1 Complaint. (csr)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officerfor possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (ca)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights) (ca)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Eric Dean, International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Iron Workers Union Local 709, William McMillan, Derrick Sample, United States Department of Labor. (ca)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Omar Alvarez.(ca)
April 11, 2022 Filing fee: $402, receipt number SAV040374. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Iron Workers Union Local 709 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Omar Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Workers Union Local 709
Represented By: Tessa A. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers
Represented By: Tessa A. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Eric Dean
Represented By: Tessa A. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. William McMillan
Represented By: Tessa A. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Derrick Sample
Represented By: Tessa A. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?