Nails v. Davis
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Defendant: Donna Long Davis
Case Number: 4:2022cv00110
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Nails. Responses due by 6/21/2022. (jrb)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 22-11788-JJ for #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Angela Nails. (wwp)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration to Take Action to Refile the Above Case Number by Angela Nails. Responses due by 6/14/2022. (kjm)
May 20, 2022 Filing 11 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to U.S. Court of Appeals re: #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: Christopher L. Ray. Court Reporter: N/A - no hearing held. Fee Paid: No. Pending COA/IFP: No. (csr)
May 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #8 Order and Report and Recommendation filed by Angela Nails. (csr)
May 20, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Complaint/RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #8 Report and Recommendations filed by Angela Nails (jrb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Dismissing re #1 Complaint filed by Angela Nails. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE her unilaterally filed re #6 Rule 26(f) Report. The Court should impose the above-described filing restrictions on her future filings. (Objections to R&R due by 5/23/2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/9/22. (loh)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; terminating re #6 Plaintiff's REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/9/22. (loh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Plaintiff's REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ca)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Angela Nails. (ca)
May 5, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (thb)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 04/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights Form.) (jlh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Angela Nails. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Nuisance) against Donna Long Davis, filed by Angela Nails. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, and #2 Envelope.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nails v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Long Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?