Edwards v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sadie Edwards
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. doing business as Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Case Number: 4:2022cv00148
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. re #41 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Savrin, Philip)
August 10, 2022 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Sadie Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Pl Reply in Support of Mot to Remand, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to Pl Reply in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Ex. C to Pl Reply in Support of Mot to Remand)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Responses #33 due by 8/31/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2022. (pts)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Replies #34 due by 8/31/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2022. (pts)
August 4, 2022 Filing 38 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to file Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Lloyd's America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2022. (Savrin, Philip)
August 4, 2022 Filing 37 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to file Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2022. (Savrin, Philip)
August 4, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. re #34 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
August 4, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Lloyd's America, Inc. re #33 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
August 3, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Sadie Edwards. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
August 3, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Sadie Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Pl Response to Lloyds MTD)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 29, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Sadie Edwards re #31 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 27, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
July 21, 2022 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
July 21, 2022 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hiscox, Inc.. (Savrin, Philip)
July 20, 2022 Filing 28 CLERK'S EXTENSION OF TIME granting #27 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) Responses to Motions to Dismiss #18 and #19 due by 8/3/2022. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/20/22. (slt)
July 19, 2022 Filing 27 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss Doc.18 and Doc. 19 by Sadie Edwards. Responses due by 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Motion Extension of Time)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 15, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand by Sadie Edwards. Responses due by 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 -Jared Gamm LinkedIn, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Carrier Partnership)(Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 8, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. re #24 Response to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
July 8, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases filed by Sadie Edwards. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 8, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Hiscox, Inc. re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Savrin, Philip)
July 7, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Fraudulent Joinder filed by Sadie Edwards. (Godfrey, Yvonne)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Seal Document Ex. 7 to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibit 7 to the Complaint under seal for 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 07/06/2022. (jlh)
July 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #21 Order due by 8/5/2022. (jlh)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER staying all discovery deadlines until the entry of the district judge's Order on the last of the pending Motions to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases in case numbers CV422-146, CV422-147, CV422-148, and CV422-035. The Clerk is directed to lift the Stay when the district judge's Order is entered. Within fourteen days of the lift of the stay, the parties are directed to confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report in whichever cases remain pending at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/6/2022. (gmh)
July 6, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Lloyd's America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sabrina Miesowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Will O'Connor)(Savrin, Philip)
July 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 4, 2022 Letter)(Savrin, Philip)
July 6, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London.(Savrin, Philip)
June 30, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Seal Document Ex. 7 to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sadie Edwards. Responses due by 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Order Granting Pl Mot for Temp Limitation of Access to Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNeeley, Madeline)
June 30, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 Consent MOTION to Seal Document Ex. 7 to Plaintiff's Complaint. (thb)
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Susan Godfrey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Godfrey, Yvonne)
June 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jed Davis Manton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Manton, Jed)
June 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Dean Whatling on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc. (Whatling, Lee)
June 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate Cases by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2022. (Savrin, Philip)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Elizabeth McNeeley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McNeeley, Madeline)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Hiscox, Inc.. Responses due by 7/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Feb 4, 2022 Letter)(Savrin, Philip)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal. Answer due 7/6/2022. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/21/2022. (csr)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Answer by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc., Lloyd's America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Savrin, Philip) Modified on 6/21/2022 (csr).
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 Statement of Motions Pending . (Savrin, Philip)
June 16, 2022 Set Deadlines: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London answer due 6/23/2022; Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. answer due 6/23/2022; Hiscox, Inc. answer due 6/23/2022; Lloyd's America, Inc. answer due 6/23/2022. (ca)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 6/26/2022. Pending Motions due by 6/30/2022. (ca)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/16/2022. (ca)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court of Liberty County, Georgia, case number STSV2022000129. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number AGASDC-3367802), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Exhibits, Summons, General Civil and Case Filing Information Form, Motion for Appointment of Dial Services to Serve Process, Order on Motion, Affidavits of Service, Motion for Temporary Limitation of Access to Exhibit, Order on Motion, Acknowledgment of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Edwards
Represented By: Jed Davis Manton
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Harris
Represented By: Madeline Elizabeth McNeeley
Represented By: Yvonne Susan Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Dean Whatling
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Represented By: Lee Dean Whatling
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's America, Inc. doing business as Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Lee Dean Whatling
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Represented By: Lee Dean Whatling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?