Crestwood Management, LLC et al v. Ferguson et al
Plaintiff: Crestwood Management, LLC, Sunset Intimates Group, Inc. and Reginald S. Howie
Defendant: Clayton Ferguson, Simpli Trading, Inc. a Canadian Company doing business as Simpli Pleasure and Simpli Assets, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00291
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Service by Publication. (csr)
February 6, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Service by Publication by Crestwood Management, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thompson, Philip)
January 27, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with exhibits, Civil Coversheet served on Justin Shaak, Officer of Defendant Simpli Trading dba Simpli Pleasure on 1/21/2023, filed by Crestwood Management, LLC. (Thompson, Philip)
January 27, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Simpli Trading, Inc. answer due 2/11/2023. (csr)
December 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing deficiency re: #9 Declaration re: #1 Complaint. (csr)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint, Report on Filing or Determination of action re trademark by Crestwood Management, LLC, Reginald S. Howie, Sunset Intimates Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint (Doc 1))(Thompson, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2022: #2 A O 120 Form) (csr).
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Crestwood Management, LLC, Reginald S. Howie, Sunset Intimates Group, Inc.. (Thompson, Philip)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Matthew Swihart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/13/22. (wwp) Modified on 12/14/2022 (thb).
December 13, 2022 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Crestwood Management, LLC, Reginald S. Howie, Sunset Intimates Group, Inc.. (Thompson, Philip)
December 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3485825, Fee Amount $200, by Crestwood Management, LLC, Reginald S. Howie, Sunset Intimates Group, Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Good Standing Certificate, #2 Supplement List of Cases)(Thompson, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2022: #3 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb).
December 13, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/26/2022. (jlh)
December 13, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number AGASDC-3485825, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/12/2022. (Attachment: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights Form.) (jlh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clayton Ferguson, Simpli Assets, Ltd., and Simpli Trading, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Simpli Assets, Ltd, and #2 Summons - Simpli Trading, Inc.) (jlh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Crestwood Management, LLC, Sunset Intimates Group, Inc., Reginald S. Howie. (Fee paid: Receipt # BGASDC-3485188, $402.00.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trademarks, #2 Exhibit B - TM Assignments, #3 Exhibit C - TM License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Articles of Merger, #5 Exhibit E - Cease and Desist Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Google Search Results, and #8 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crestwood Management, LLC et al v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestwood Management, LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew Swihart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunset Intimates Group, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew Swihart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald S. Howie
Represented By: Philip M. Thompson
Represented By: Matthew Swihart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpli Trading, Inc. a Canadian Company doing business as Simpli Pleasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpli Assets, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?