Valmont et al v. HSL Husum Shipping Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Tim B. Valmont and Linda Valmont
Defendant: HSL Husum Shipping Ltd. and Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG
Case Number: 4:2022cv00305
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2023. Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Motions due by 9/29/2023. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 6/29/2023. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 7/28/2023. Status Report due by 9/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/10/23. (loh)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baiad, Todd)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting re #14 Motion for Leave of Absence for the dates of April 10-14, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/17/23. (loh)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to HSL Husum Shipping Ltd., Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG for dates of : April 10-14, 2023 by HSL Husum Shipping Ltd., Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG. Responses due by 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baiad, Todd)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to HSL Husum Shipping Ltd., Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG for dates of : April 10-14, 2023. (thb)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Wilson, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilson, James)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R. Sprouse on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sprouse, Zachary)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Savage, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Savage, Brent)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by HSL Husum Shipping Ltd.. (Baiad, Todd)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG. (Baiad, Todd)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by HSL Husum Shipping Ltd.. (Baiad, Todd)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG. (Baiad, Todd)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by HSL Husum Shipping Ltd., Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG.(Baiad, Todd)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/30/2022. (jlh)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Removal NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/9/2023.) (jlh)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court of Chatham County, Georgia, case number STCV22-01601, filed by HSL Husum Shipping Ltd. and Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3494958.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings - Civil Case Information Form, Summons, Complaint, Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Defendants, Plaintiffs' First Request for Production, Application for Service by Publication, and Order for Service by Publication, #2 Statement of Pending Motions, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valmont et al v. HSL Husum Shipping Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim B. Valmont
Represented By: Brent Savage, Sr
Represented By: James H. Wilson, III
Represented By: Zachary R. Sprouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Valmont
Represented By: Brent Savage, Sr
Represented By: James H. Wilson, III
Represented By: Zachary R. Sprouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSL Husum Shipping Ltd.
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammonia Reederei GMBH & Co. KG
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?