Richardson v. Morse et al
Plaintiff: Randal Lamar Richardson
Defendant: John E. Morse, Timothy Walmsley, Shaleena Cook Jones, Margaret H. Deleon, Katherine M. Kelly and James S. Byrne
Case Number: 4:2023cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Letter from Randal Richardson. (jrb)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint should be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2023). ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Randal Lamar Richardson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 02/27/2023. (jlh)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel and dismissing as moot #16 Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 02/27/2023. (jlh)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Randal Lamar Richardson. Responses due by 3/9/2023. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jlh)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Order Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Randal Lamar Richardson re #1 Complaint. (ca)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Randal Lamar Richardson. Responses due by 2/28/2023. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(ca)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Randal Lamar Richardson. (wwp)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by Randal Lamar Richardson re #1 Complaint. (ca)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter regarding legal mail from Randal Lamar Richardson. (ca)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT by Prisoner Randal Lamar Richardson to collection of fees. (ca)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Randal Lamar Richardson. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2023: #1 Correct Image) (jrb).
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 , #7 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within fourteen days of the date this Order is served. PLRA due by 2/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/19/2023. (maa)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Randal Lamar Richardson. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #3 Order, filed by Randal Lamar Richardson. (loh)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Inmate Account Statement by Randal Lamar Richardson. (loh)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Randal Lamar Richardson. (maa)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to resubmit a renewed #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis no later than 14 days from the date of entry of this Order. (Compliance due by 1/19/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/05/2023. (Attachment: #1 IFP Short Form.) (jlh)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randal Lamar Richardson. Responses due by 1/17/2023. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(pts)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Randal Lamar Richardson.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Morse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Lamar Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Walmsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaleena Cook Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret H. Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?