VPR Brands, LP v. Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC et al
Defendant: Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, Vimesh Patel and ECTO WORLD LLC d/b/a DEMAND VAPE
Cross Defendant: VPR Brands, LP
Cross Claimant: IMIRACLE (HK)., LTD.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00115
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response to Crossclaims (ECF 19) , by VPR Brands, LP. Responses due by 7/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothman, Joel)
June 28, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response to Crossclaims (ECF 19). (csr)
June 27, 2023 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by VPR Brands, LP. (Rothman, Joel)
June 27, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1). After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 7/11/2023. (csr)
June 26, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss VAPE LOFT DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by VPR Brands, LP. Responses due by 7/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GD Sigelei TM Assignment to iMiracle, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exclusive Manufacturing Agreement)(Rothman, Joel)
June 7, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint , Third Party CROSSCLAIM against VPR Brands, LP by IMIRACLE (HK)., LTD..(Litman, Seth)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Gregory Troutman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/6/23. (loh)
June 6, 2023 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to IMIRACLE (HK)., LTD. (csr)
June 6, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Submitted (Pedigo, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 6/20/2023. (csr)
June 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: #10 Summons Submitted. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2023: #1 Correct Attachment) (csr).
June 6, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to ECTO WORLD LLC d/b/a DEMAND VAPE. (csr)
June 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (csr)
June 6, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3597007, Fee Amount $200. (csr)
June 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3597007, Fee Amount $200, by Vimesh Patel, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC. Responses due by 6/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Cases, #2 Supplement Good Standing Certificate)(Pedigo, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2023: #3 Flattened PDF - Main Document) (csr).
June 5, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Submitted (Pedigo, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2023: #1 Flattened PDF) (csr).
June 5, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Vimesh Patel, Vimesh Patel, Vimesh Patel, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC. (Pedigo, Jason)
June 5, 2023 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Vimesh Patel, Vimesh Patel, Vimesh Patel, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC. (Pedigo, Jason)
June 5, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ECTO WORLD LLC d/b/a DEMAND VAPE, IMIRACLE (HK)., LTD., COUNTERCLAIM against VPR Brands, LP by Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, Vimesh Patel, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Clean Vapor, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - 884 Application, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - 616 Registration)(Pedigo, Jason)
May 2, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing of Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (ca)
May 2, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vimesh Patel, The Vape Loft GA, LLC, Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC, Vape Loft Columbus, LLC, Vape Loft Hunter, LLC, Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC. (ca)
May 2, 2023 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/2/2023. (ca)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by VPR Brands, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Elf Specimen, #3 Exhibit 3 - Evidence of Purchases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VPR Brands, LP v. Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: VPR Brands, LP
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vape Loft Abercorn, LLC
Represented By: J. Gregory Troutman
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vape Loft Columbus, LLC
Represented By: J. Gregory Troutman
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vape Loft Hunter, LLC
Represented By: J. Gregory Troutman
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vape Loft Richmond Hill, LLC
Represented By: J. Gregory Troutman
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vape Loft GA, LLC
Represented By: J. Gregory Troutman
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimesh Patel
Represented By: J. Gregory Troutman
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECTO WORLD LLC d/b/a DEMAND VAPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: IMIRACLE (HK)., LTD.
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?