Paschall v. Hopkins et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Paschall
Defendant: Cornell Hopkins, Beemac, Inc. doing business as Beemac Trucking and Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv00254
Filed: September 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE that discovery is not filed with the Court re 22 Certificate of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures. (thb)
November 8, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE that discovery is not filed with the Court re 23 Certificate of Service of First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (thb)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney Mary Hashemi for the dates of Wednesday, December 20, 2023 through Tuesday, December, 26, 2023 for family vacation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/7/23. (wwp)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting re #18 Motion for Leave of Absence for the dates of Tuesday, December 26, 2023 through Wednesday, January, 3, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/7/23. (loh)
November 7, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #18 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024. (thb)
November 7, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024 by Jessica Paschall. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Hashemi, Mary)
November 7, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 20, 2023 through Dec. 26, 2023 by Jessica Paschall. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Hashemi, Mary)
November 7, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024, #17 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 20, 2023 through Dec. 26, 2023 (thb)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2023. Discovery due by 1/16/2024. Motions due by 5/10/2024. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 3/12/2024. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/12/2024. Status Report due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/31/23. (loh)
October 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair Joseph Cash on behalf of All Defendants (Cash, Blair) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2023: #1 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb).
October 26, 2023 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Eason, Donavan)
October 26, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (thb)
October 19, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Arch Insurance Company, Beemac, Inc.. (Eason, Donavan)
October 5, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1). If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement)(thb)
October 4, 2023 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arch Insurance Company, Beemac, Inc., Cornell Hopkins. (Eason, Donavan)
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Cornell Hopkins.(Eason, Donavan)
October 4, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Beemac, Inc..(Eason, Donavan)
October 4, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Arch Insurance Company.(Eason, Donavan)
September 12, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Beemac, Inc., Cornell Hopkins. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2023: #1 Corrected Summons) (ca).
September 12, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/12/2023. (ca)
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jessica Paschall. (ca)
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jessica Paschall. (ca)
September 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jessica Paschall. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3659847, $402) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paschall v. Hopkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Paschall
Represented By: Cecil Clay Davis
Represented By: Mary Kathleen Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Hopkins
Represented By: Donavan K. Eason
Represented By: Blair Joseph Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beemac, Inc. doing business as Beemac Trucking
Represented By: Blair Joseph Cash
Represented By: Donavan K. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Blair Joseph Cash
Represented By: Donavan K. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?