Jones v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: George T Jones
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union and John Collins
Case Number: 4:2023cv00338
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Randal Hall
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 400001251. (wwp)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING the #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion, to which no objections have been filed, denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and directing Plaintiff to submit the appropriate filing fee within twenty-one days of the service date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/05/2024. (jlh)
January 5, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/26/2024. (jlh)
December 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Trial Preparation and Discovery Plan by George T. Jones. (loh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied. Objections to R&R due by 12/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/30/2023. (kjm)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (maa)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/28/2023. (maa)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George T Jones. Responses due by 12/12/2023. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(maa)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Collins, Navy Federal Credit Union, filed by George T Jones.(maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2023: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (maa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George T Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?