Williams v. Hardin
Plaintiff: Franklin L. Williams
Defendant: James L. Hardin
Case Number: 5:2007cv00031
Filed: April 4, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Appling
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Supplement Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 60 (b)(6)(4) of Void Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/29/18. (loh)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 52 Motion for Relief from a Judgment or Order. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/27/17. (jrb)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: dismissing 1 Complaint filed by Franklin L. Williams. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2007. Signed by Judge James E. Graham on 4/20/07. (slt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?