Lee v. Upton
Petitioner: James Allyson Lee
Respondent: Stephen Upton
Case Number: 5:2010cv00017
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Charlton
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying Lee's 100 Motion to Alter and Amend the Judgment; Lee's Application for a Certificate of Appealability is GRANTED as to the issue of whether the Georgia Supreme Court's determination-that Lee was not prejudiced by an y deficiency on the part of Lee's trial counsel in investigating, developing, preparing, and presenting mitigating evidence at Lee's sentencing-involved an unreasonable application of clearly established Federal law or was based on an unreasonable determination of the facts in light of the evidence presented. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/20/2019. (csr)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DENYING Lee's 29 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/19/2017. (csr)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Petitioner's request for discovery related to his Brady claim is GRANTED as outlined in Part III.A.2. Petitioner's request for necessary expert and investigative services is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/20/2013. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Allyson Lee
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?