Williams v. United States of America
Petitioner: Franklin L. Williams
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2013cv00027
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Ware
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Ruling on Attached Motion. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/27/17. (jlm)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 11 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; dismissing as moot 14 Motion to transmit PSI and PSR Records on Appeal. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/21/2013. (loh)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING re 2 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/29/2013. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Franklin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?