Daniels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard W. Daniels
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2016cv00008
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Brantley
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 14 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court. The Court AFFIRMS the decision of the Commissioner. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/23/2017. (csr)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court AFFIRM the Commissioner's decision re: 1 Complaint filed by Richard W. Daniels. It is also RECOMMENDED that the Court DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/27/2017. (csr)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER directing filing of Briefs in Appeal from Social Security Benefits Decision. ( Brief due by 6/17/2016.). Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/18/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Daniels
Represented By: Richard H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John Thomas Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?