Palmer v. Hininger et al

Plaintiff: Stacy Clyde Palmer
Defendant: Damon T. Hininger, Homer Bryson, Hilton Hall, Andre Ford, Patrick Cummiskey, Jorge Dominicis, Carl Keldie, John Hulett, M. McCleod and Julia Hester
Case Number: 5:2016cv00039
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Coffee
Referring Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 50 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court. The Court DENIES Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENIES Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/6/2018. (csr)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Sanctions and 30 Motion for Proposed Settlement; dismissing as premature Plaintiff's 42 Motion in Limine, and dismissing in part Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Copy of the Docket Sheet and Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/9/2018. (csr)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 15 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Hininger, Bryson, Hall, Cummiskey, Dominicis, and Keldie without prejudice. The C ourt also DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Ford in their entirety and Plaintiff's violation of policy claims against Defendants Hester, McCleod, and Hulett. Plaintiff's deliberate indifference claims against Defendant Hester, McCleod, and Hulett shall remain pending. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/14/2016. (csr)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Hininger, Bryson, Hall, Cummiskey, Dominicis, and Keldie without prejudice re 5 Amended Complaint filed by Stacy Clyde Palmer. I f urther RECOMMEND that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Ford and Plaintiff's violation of policy claims against Defendants Hester, McCleod, and Hulett. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Rec ommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 11/18/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/4/2016. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Hininger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Clyde Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon T. Hininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cummiskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Dominicis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Keldie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McCleod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?