Mapp v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: |
Steve Mapp |
Defendant: |
Doug Williams, Mrs. Yarbrough, Gramiak and Edwina Johnson |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00056 |
Filed: |
July 15, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Waycross Office |
County: |
Ware |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Stan Baker |
Presiding Judge: |
Lisa G. Wood |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 31 and granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk is directed to close case and enter judgment of dismissal. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/9/18. (slt)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
31
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendants' 23 Motion, DISMISS Plaintiff's 8 Amended Complaint, DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal, and DE NY Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2018). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/14/2018. (csr)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
16
ORDER ADOPTING 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Gramiak and Johnson without prejudice; and, dismisses Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against Defendants Williams and Yarbrough in their official capacities. Plaintiff's deliberate indifference claims against Defendants Williams and Yarbrough remain pending. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/19/16. (slt)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
7
ORDER deferring conducting a frivolity review of Plaintiff's 1 Complaint and DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, (Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2016.). Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/20/2016. (ca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?