Lundy v. Bryson et al
Plaintiff: Quintavious Lundy
Defendant: Homer Bryson, James K. Cox, Jr., Kimberly Lowe and William Steedly
Case Number: 5:2016cv00071
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 67 Order. This civil action stands closed. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 08/19/2020. (MG)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 66 of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court. The Court GRANTS Defendants' 50 Motion for Summary Judgment, DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint, DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal in Defendants' favor, and DENIES Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/17/2020. (ca)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 38 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court and grants in part and denies in part Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss. The Court hereby LIFTS the stay imposed in this case. Defendants' Answer is due within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/20/2018. (ca)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 13 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's 4 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/10/2017. (ca)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any response in opposition to Defendants' 22 MOTION to Dismiss or to inform the court of his decision not to oppose within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is instructed to attach a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/6/2017. (ca)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Defendants' 23 Motion to Stay Proceedings. All proceedings, including discovery, are stayed pending a ruling by the Court on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. This ruling does not affect Plaintiff's obligation to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/5/2017. (ca)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities, all claims for punitive and compensatory damages, and all claims against Defendants Gramiak and Bowles. Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief and nominal damages for violation for his due process rights shall proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/14/2016. (ca)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS all monetary damages claims against Defendants in their official capacities, all claims for punitive and compensatory damages, and all claims against Defendants Gramiak and Bow les re 1 Complaint filed by Quintavious Lundy. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objection within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/3/2016. (ca)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court should DENY Plaintiff's 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendat ion to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDAION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/21/2016. (ca)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court should DENY Plaintiff's 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Add itionally, the Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to add the following Defendants, named in Plaintiff's Supplemental Complaint, to the docket of this case: Thomas Gramiak, Warden of Ware State Prison; and Elizabeth Bowles, Ware State Prison Chief Counselor. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/21/2016. (csr)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER transferring the 1 Complaint filed by Quintavious Lundy to the Waycross division. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/17/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy v. Bryson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintavious Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Steedly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?