Pelka v. Ware County, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Susi Emerita Pelka
Defendant: Ware County, Georgia, Randy Royal, Danny Christmas, City of Waycross, Georgia, Jeffery Nichols, Belenda McElroy, Dwayne Howell, Donny Spradley, James Sowell, James Aldridge, Nathaniel Roberts, Michael Dean, Joshua Rylee, Gary Simmons, Hubert Ryals, James Lee, Peter Wrobel, Southeast Georgia Primary Care, P.C., Southern Correctional Medicine, LLC, Donna Bennett, Michelle Chancey, Johnny Lee Jones, Jr., Susan Martin, Sharon Ray, Lynn Streat and Kristy White
Case Number: 5:2016cv00108
Filed: December 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Ware
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER overruling 140 Objections; denying 141 Motion for Continuance of the Taxing of Costs. The Clerk is directed to tax costs in the amount of $5,164.71. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/06/2019. (thb)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER dismissing with prejudice all of Plaintiff's claims asserted in this matter re 132 MOTION for FRCP 41(A) Dismissal of Less Than All Defendants. The Clerk shall terminate all deadlines and motions and closed this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/20/2019. (thb)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER dismissing with prejudice Defendants Ware County, GA; Randy Royal, Individually and in his official capacity as Sheriff of Ware County, GA; Danny Christmas, Individually and in his official capacity as Administrator of the Ware County Jail; Jef fery Nichols, in his individual capacity; Belenda McElroy, in her individual capacity; Dwayne Howell, in his individual capacity; Donny Spradley, in his individual capacity; James Sowell in his individual capacity; James Aldridge, in his individual c apacity; Nathaniel Roberts, in his individual capacity; Michael Dean, in his individual capacity; Joshua Rylee, in his individual capacity; Gary Simmons, in his individual capacity; Hubert Ryals, in his individual capacity; James Lee, in his individu al capacity; Donna Bennett, in her individual capacity; Michelle Chancey, in her individual capacity; Johnny Lee Jones, Jr., in his individualcapacity; Susan Martin, in her individual capacity; Sharon Ray, in her individual capacity; Lynn Streat, in her individual capacity; Kristy White, in her individual capacity (the "Ware County Defendants"). The Clerk shall terminate all deadlines and motions related to the Ware County Defendants. As between Plaintiff and the Ware County Defendants , each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Defendants City of Waycross, Georgia; Peter Wrobel, M.D.; Peter Wrobel, M.D., P.C.; Southeast Georgia Primary Care, P.C.; and Southern Correctional Medicine, LLC shall remain parties to this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/11/2018. (thb)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss. Count One and Nine are DISMISSED against City and County only; and Count Seven is DISMISSED, with respect to Sheriff Royal, in his official capacity. All other counts remain. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/29/2017. (csr)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Movants' 48 Motion to Stay. Discovery shall proceed amongst the parties, but only on the limited basis set forth herein. The parties shall confer within seven (7) days of this Order and shall file their Rule 26(f) Report within seven (7) days of the Rule 26 conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/3/2017.(csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelka v. Ware County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susi Emerita Pelka
Represented By: J. Mark Hatfield
Represented By: Thomas Ellison Hatfield
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ware County, Georgia
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Royal
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Christmas
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waycross, Georgia
Represented By: Frances L. Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Nichols
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belenda McElroy
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Howell
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Spradley
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sowell
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Aldridge
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Roberts
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dean
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rylee
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Simmons
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Ryals
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lee
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Wrobel
Represented By: Wayne Dale McGrew, III
Represented By: Christian J. Steinmetz, III
Represented By: Wayne Dale McGrew, III
Represented By: Christian J. Steinmetz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Georgia Primary Care, P.C.
Represented By: Wayne Dale McGrew, III
Represented By: Christian J. Steinmetz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Correctional Medicine, LLC
Represented By: Wayne Dale McGrew, III
Represented By: Christian J. Steinmetz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Lee Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Streat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?