Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Amos et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Jack Amos and Riverjac, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00063
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
County: Ware
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 21 INFORMATIVE NOTICE ONLY re #20 Notice of Interested Parties, #19 Notice. (ca)
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Jack Amos. (Futch, Kenneth) Modified on 10/4/2018 (ca).
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jack Amos. (Futch, Kenneth) Modified on 10/4/2018 (ca). Modified on 10/10/2018 (ca).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Set Aside #11 Clerk's Entry of Default. The hearing scheduled for 10/5/18 is CANCELLED as moot. The case will proceed. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/2/2018. (ca)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #15 First MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 10:30 AM in Waycross - 3rd Floor Courtroom before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Jack Amos. (Futch, Kenneth)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default by Jack Amos. Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Futch, Kenneth)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #11 Clerk's Entry of Default filed 9/18/18. Return to sender. Mail sent to Riverjac, LLC, c/o Registered Agent Jack Amos. (ca)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jack Amos, Riverjac, LLC. (ca)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 5, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to the standing order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker-MJ no longer assigned to the case. (slt)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Riverjac, LLC served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald) Modified on 8/21/2018 (ca).
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Jack Amos served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald) Modified on 8/21/2018 (ca).
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Reemsnyder, Ronald) Modified on 8/13/2018 (ca).
August 13, 2018 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2428635. (ca)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/13/2018. (ca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jack Amos, Riverjac, LLC. (ca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (ca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (ca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (ca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Amos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Amos
Represented By: Kenneth E. Futch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverjac, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E. Futch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald D. Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?