Jones v. Johns
Petitioner: Lloyd Harold Jones
Respondent: Tracy Johns
Case Number: 5:2019cv00061
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Lloyd Harold Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ca)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #8 Response. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/24/2019. (ca)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tracy Johns filed by Lloyd Harold Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ca)
August 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses / Objections due by 9/13/2019. (ca)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tracy Johns. The Court ORDERS Petitioner to file any objections to the Respondent's motion for dismissal or to otherwise inform the Court of his decision not to object within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/30/2019. (ca)
August 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Dismiss. (ca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Tracy Johns. Responses due by 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Roger Perry w/attachs)(Leithart, Otto)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Attorney General of the U.S. for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lloyd Harold Jones, #2 Order Directing USMS Service of Process, on 8/19/2019. (ca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Tracy Johns for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lloyd Harold Jones, #2 Order Directing USMS Service of Process, on 8/14/2019. (ca)
August 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2019. (ca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to U.S. Attorney for the SDGA for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lloyd Harold Jones, #2 Order Directing USMS Service of Process, on 8/14/2019. (ca)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process by registered or certified mail a copy of the #1 Petition and a copy of this Order upon: (1) the Attorney General of the U.S.; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/17/2019. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #1 Prepared 285 Forms) (ca).
July 15, 2019 Filing fee payment received, Amount $5.00, Receipt BWK008658. (ca)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lloyd Harold Jones. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tracy Johns
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lloyd Harold Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?