Sanks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Natasha Trinique Sanks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00063
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Attorney General of the U.S. for #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint filed by Natasha Trinique Sanks, on 8/21/2019. (ca)
August 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 11/27/2019. (ca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA for #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint filed by Natasha Trinique Sanks, on 8/19/2019 (ca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security for #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint filed by Natasha Trinique Sanks, on 8/19/2019. (ca)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Leithart, Otto)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendants by the United States Marshal without prepayment of cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms). (csr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted. (csr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Natasha Trinique Sanks. (csr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Natasha Trinique Sanks. (csr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Natasha Trinique Sanks. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Natasha Trinique Sanks. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Trinique Sanks
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?