UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Rigby
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Julian Rigby
Case Number: 5:2019cv00078
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Julian Rigby served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (Schwedler, Patrick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Julian Rigby. (jrb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Rule 26 Instruction ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/19/2019. (MG)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julian Rigby, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C). (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Rigby
Represented By: Donald F. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bobby L. Christine
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Porter
Represented By: Patrick J. Schwedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?