Coffee County Board of Commissioners v. McVeigh
Plaintiff: Coffee County Board of Commissioners
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Lovie McVeigh
Case Number: 5:2019cv00080
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Remand or Response to Notice of Removal due by 11/19/2019. (ca)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand and Conduct Rule 26 Conference. Plaintiff shall file its motion to remand or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's notice of removal on or before 11/19/19. In addition, counsel shall meet and confer regarding Rule 26 obligations on or before 11/19/19 and shall file their Rule 26(f) report within seven days of this meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/21/2019. (ca)
October 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand. (ca)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand by Coffee County Board of Commissioners. Responses due by 10/22/2019. (Rowell, Anthony)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #4 Rule 26(f) Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, Set/Reset Deadlines, #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Set/Reset Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, by Coffee County Board of Commissioners. (Rowell, Anthony)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Rowell on behalf of Coffee County Board of Commissioners (Rowell, Anthony)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 McVeigh's ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST COFFEE COUNTY against Coffee County Board of Commissioners, COUNTERCLAIM against Coffee County Board of Commissioners by Lovie McVeigh.(Banks, Jeffery)
September 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney(s) for Plaintiff to submit entry of appearance by 9/30/2019. (MG)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/23/2019. (MG)
September 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Refile all pending motions previously filed in State Court due by 10/04/2019. (MG) Modified on 9/24/2019 (MG).
September 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lovie McVeigh answer due 9/27/2019. (MG)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE To All Counsel Of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Correct Attachment) (MG).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Virginia N. Hall re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lovie McVeigh. (MG)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lovie McVeigh from Superior Court of Coffee County, Georgia, case number SUS2019000267. (Filing fee paid on 09/20/2019- $400.00; receipt number 113J-2688432). (Attachments: #1 Complaint For Injunctive Relief And Damages). (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Plaintiff's Motion And Brief In Support Of Its Motion For Service By Publication) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #3 Return of Service Unexecuted) (MG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffee County Board of Commissioners v. McVeigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Lovie McVeigh
Represented By: Jeffery Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coffee County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony A. Rowell
Represented By: Virginia N. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?