Wilkins v. Saul
Plaintiff: Clyde Wilkins
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00083
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to U.S. Attorney General and Andrew Saul for #1 Complaint, #5 Order Directing USMS Service of Process. Certificate of services signed by E Sase for U.S. Attorney General, and Hazel Tom on 10/22/19. (ca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of Andrew Saul (Patrick, Bradford)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process re #1 Complaint filed by Clyde Wilkins. The U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendant, the Attorney General of the U.S., and the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA without prepayment of cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/10/2019. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #1 Prepared 285 forms) (ca).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/10/2019. (ca)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (csr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clyde Wilkins. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Clyde Wilkins. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Wilkins
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?