Reliford v. Saul
Plaintiff: Samson Reliford
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00087
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to the U.S. Attorney General for #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and #1 Complaint filed by Samson Reliford, served on 10/22/2019. Certificate signed by E. Sase on 10/22/2019. (csr) Modified on 11/1/2019 (csr).
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Andrew Saul for #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and #1 Complaint filed by Samson Reliford, served on 10/25/2019. Certificate of service signed by Cassandra White on 10/25/2019. (csr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Andrew Saul (Leithart, Otto)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process upon the Defendant, the Attorney General of the United States, and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms). (csr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (MG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Samson Reliford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Samson Reliford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reliford v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samson Reliford
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?