Jacobs v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Anthony Jacobs
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00094
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. Answer due 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/06/2019. (MG)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Responses due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Consent Order))(Crow, Nikole)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before December 9, 2019. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to extend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on November 13, 2019. (edd)
November 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (slt)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Responses due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Consent Order))(Crow, Nikole)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikole M. Crow on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Crow, Nikole)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Bondurant on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Anthony Jacobs. (Robinson, Douglas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Anthony Jacobs. (Robinson, Douglas) Incorrect PDF format. Modified on 10/31/2019 (slt).
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Jacobs. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Robinson, Douglas)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/22/2019. (MG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Anthony Jacobs. Filing Fee paid: Receipt # 113J-2709871- $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG) Modified on 10/22/2019 (MG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Nikole M. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jacobs
Represented By: Douglas Max Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?