Smith v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Smith
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00106
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Andrew Saul (Statkus, Shannon)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to Andrew Saul. Signed by Unknown Person (Signature Illegible) on 12/09/2019. (MG)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia, Civil Process Clerk. Signed by Rosa Oates on 12/06/2019. (MG)
December 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Saul answer due 3/15/2020. (MG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia, Civil Process Clerk. Signed by Rosa Oates on 12/06/2019. (MG)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendant by the United States Marshal without prepayment of cost. The United States Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendant, the Attorney General of the United States, and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia without prepayment of cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/25/2019. (MG)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted. (MG)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rose Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Rose Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Smith
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?