Guentangue v. Gartland et al
Petitioner: Patrick Guentangue
Respondent: Patrick Gartland, William Barr, John Tsoukaris and Chad Woll
Case Number: 5:2020cv00008
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/30/2020. (csr)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Petitioner to file any objections to the Respondent's #12 MOTION to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/16/2020. (csr)
March 12, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Dismiss. (csr)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Patrick Gartland. Responses due by 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Carlos Santiago w attchs)(Statkus, Shannon)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Patrick Guentangue filed by Patrick Gartland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Carlos Santiago w/attchs)(Statkus, Shannon)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Objection to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Return on Order to Show Cause, filed by Patrick Guentangue. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope). (csr)
March 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Patrick Gartland answer due 3/11/2020. (csr)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time Respond to Petitioner's #1 Petition. Respondent's Response due 3/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/2/2020. (csr) Modified on 3/2/2020 (csr).
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 U.S. Marshal Return as to the Attorney General of the United States for #3 Order and #1 Petition served on 2/11/2020. Cert mail card returned signed by E. Sase on 2/11/2020. (csr)
February 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Return on Order to Show Cause. (csr)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Return on Order to Show Cause , by Patrick Gartland. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Statkus, Shannon)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick Guentangue. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 U.S. Marshal Return as to Patrick Gartland for #3 Order and #1 Petition served on 2/5/2020. Cert mail returned signed by Rosa Oates on 2/5/20. (csr)
February 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: William Barr answer due 2/26/2020; Patrick Gartland answer due 2/26/2020; John Tsoukaris answer due 2/26/2020; Chad Woll answer due 2/26/2020. (csr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia for #3 Order and #1 Petition, served on 2/5/2020. Cert mail card signed by K. Cutillo on 2/5/20. (csr)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Service by USMS of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Patrick Guentangue. Respondent is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, within 21 days of the date of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms). (csr)
January 17, 2020 Filing fee payment received, Amount $5.00, Receipt BWK009014. (ca)
January 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/7/2020 re: #2 Deficiency Notice. (csr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Deficiency Notice re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filing fee has not been paid. (csr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Patrick Guentangue. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guentangue v. Gartland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Tsoukaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Woll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Guentangue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?