Milford Casualty Ins. Co. v. Meeks et al
Plaintiff: Milford Casualty Ins. Co.
Defendant: William Stacey Meeks, Abdi Mahab and BIH Express, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00036
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Abdi Mahab answer due 5/15/2020. (MG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Summons, Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Abdi Mahab on 04/24/2020, filed by Milford Casualty Ins. Co.. (Allred, William)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Abdi Mahab. (MG)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Allred, William)
April 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: BIH Express, Inc. answer due 4/16/2020; William Stacey Meeks answer due 4/21/2020. (MG)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on William Stacey Meeks on 03/31/2020, filed by Milford Casualty Ins. Co. (Allred, William). Modified on 4/6/2020 (MG).
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Coversheet served on BIH Express, Inc. on 03/26/2020, filed by Milford Casualty Ins. Co. (Allred, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Milford Casualty Ins. Co. redacted Exhibit B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Allred, William) Modified on 3/20/2020 (csr).
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 03/18/2020. (MG)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Milford Casualty Ins. Co. (MG)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (MG)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Milford Casualty Ins. Co. Fee paid: Receipt # 113J-2805442, $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MG) Modified on 3/19/2020 (cmr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milford Casualty Ins. Co. v. Meeks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stacey Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdi Mahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIH Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milford Casualty Ins. Co.
Represented By: William S. Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?