Mohammed v. Warden, Folkston ICE Processing Center
Petitioner: Farid Mohammed
Respondent: Thomas Giles, Chad Wolf, Ronald D. Vitiello, Patrick Gartland, Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kevin K. Mcaleenan, U. S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Warden, Folkston ICE Processing Center
Case Number: 5:2020cv00071
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Order #12 . Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/27/2020. (ca)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #10 of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court, DISMISSES without prejudice Mohammed's 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition #1 for failure to following this Court's directives and Local Rules, DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal, and DENIES Mohammed in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/27/2020. (ca)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Farid Mohammed re #10 : Return To Sender: No Longer Here 7/16. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable To Forward. (MG)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS without prejudice Mohammed's 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition, doc. #1 , for failure to follow this Court's directive and Local Rules, DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal, and DENY Mohammed leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/13/2020. (ca)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Deficiency Notice #7 . Mail sent to Farid Mohammed at Folkston ICE Processing Center. (ca)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Notice of Transfer #6 and Notice of Filing Deficiency #7 . Mail sent to Farid Mohammed at Folkston Immigration Detention Center. (ca) Modified on 6/10/2020 (ca).
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 6/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(ca)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE To All Counsel Of Record re #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (ca)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02170. Case transferred electronically
June 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon terminated from case. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC SD GA, Waycross Division. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Farid Mohammed re #4 Order. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this action, including all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings, and exhibits filed herein (if any), is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, the Waycross Division. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 6/2/2020. (tcc)
May 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Farid Mohammed re #3 Notice (Other). (tcc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 26, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop)
May 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Farid Mohammed re #2 Order and NEF. (eop)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, titled, Emergency Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C.2241 and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Farid Mohammed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. Warden, Folkston ICE Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. Mcaleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U. S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Folkston ICE Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Farid Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?