Jeff v. Coleman
Plaintiff: Ricky Jeff
Defendant: Warden Coleman
Case Number: 5:2020cv00106
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Ricky Jeff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/5/2020. (ca)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ricky Jeff. (csr)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT by Prisoner Ricky Jeff to collection of fees. (csr)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 08/20/2020. (MG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Jeff. Responses due by 9/1/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warden Coleman, filed by Ricky Jeff.(MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeff v. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Jeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?