Aldridge v. Beaumier et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Aldridge
Defendant: Clinton Wayne Harper, Beverly Beaumier, Monica Brown and Raven Golden
Case Number: 5:2021cv00015
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Defendant Beaumier's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant Beaumier may file a brief in support of her motion to dismiss totaling 33 pages. Should any party opposing said motion to dismiss need additional pages to respond to the motion to dismiss, that party's response can be up to 33 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 12, 2021. (edd)
April 8, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by Beverly Beaumier. Responses due by 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Coffee County Complaint, #3 Exhibit Order of Dismissal on Coffee County Complaint)(Green, Noah)
April 7, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Green on behalf of Beverly Beaumier (Green, Noah)
April 7, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #31 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (thb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Beverly Beaumier. Responses due by 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Additional Pages)(Henefeld, Paul)
April 6, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint re Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint by Clinton Wayne Harper.(Smith, John) Modified on 4/6/2021 (thb).
April 5, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolutions of the Motions to Dismiss filed by Beverly Beaumier. (Henefeld, Paul)
April 5, 2021 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, 1st Amended Complaint, 2nd Amended Complaint, 3rd Amended Complaint, 4th Amended Complaint, 5th Amended Complaint served on Raven Golden on April 3, 2021, filed by Rachel Aldridge. (Savage, Brent)
March 26, 2021 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Raven Golden. (thb)
March 26, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Submitted (Savage, Brent)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss. The motion hearing scheduled for April 13, 2021 will be continued until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/26/2021. (ca)
March 25, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint Dated March 25, 2021 against Rachel Aldridge, filed by Rachel Aldridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rachel Aldridge Text Messages, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Beaumier Text Message, #4 Exhibit Summons - TO BE EXECUTED)(Savage, Brent)
March 23, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof : Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2021 10:00 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom No. 1 - before Judge Lisa G. Wood. (WS)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting re #22 Motion for Hearing. The Court will hold a Motion Hearing on Tuesday, April 13,2021 at 10:00 a.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Brunswick, Georgia. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/23/21. (loh)
March 23, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #22 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof Plaintiff's Request for Oral Argument on Defendant Beaumier's Motion to Dismiss (slt)
March 23, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof Plaintiff's Request for Oral Argument on Defendant Beaumier's Motion to Dismiss. (cmr)
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof Plaintiff's Request for Oral Argument on Defendant Beaumier's Motion to Dismiss by Rachel Aldridge. Responses due by 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request for Oral Argument)(Savage, Brent)
March 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolutions of the Motions to Dismiss. Replies due by 4/5/2021. (jlh)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court vacates its #17 Order granting a stay in discovery. Defendants may file a reply to Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Stay within 14 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 03/22/2021. (jlh)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #15 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice against Defendant Brown. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. Defendant Brown's #14 MOTION to Dismiss is therefore DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant Brown as a party to this lawsuit. Plaintiff's claims against the other Defendants remain pending. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/22/2021. (ca)
March 19, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #17 Order. (thb)
March 18, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolutions of the Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Rachel Aldridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Beverly Beaumier Facebook Messages, #2 Exhibit B - Obituary - Brooklynn Aldridge, #3 Exhibit C - Autopsy Report, #4 Exhibit D - CPS 2-11-18 Intake Report, #5 Exhibit E - CPS 3-7-18 Intake Report, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Rachel Aldridge, #7 Exhibit G - DFCS Policy 5.6 - Safety Resource, #8 Exhibit H - 19.09 Safety Screenings)(Savage, Brent)
March 18, 2021 Filing 18 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Stay, by Rachel Aldridge. Responses due by 4/1/2021. (Savage, Brent) Modified on 3/19/2021 (thb).
March 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/25/2021. (maa)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (VACATING the granting of #10 Motion to Stay Discovery. See #21 Order.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to add Raven Golden as a party defendant ; granting #6 Motion to join Rachel Aldridge, as temporary Administrator of the Estate of Brooklynn Aldridge, as a party plaintiff; granting #10 Motion to Stay Discovery. The Court stays discovery pending resolution of Defendants' motions to dismiss. The Court directs parties to confer within 14 days of a ruling on the motions to dismiss and, if the case remains pending, to file a Rule 26(f) report 7 days after their conference. The Court orders Plaintiff to file her Amended Complaint adding parties within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 03/18/2021. (maa) Modified on 3/22/2021 (jlh).
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Beverly Beaumier's Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Rachel Aldridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1st Statewide Judicial Emergency Order, #2 Exhibit B - Emergency Order 3rd Extension, #3 Exhibit C - Amanda Coleman Verdict and Sentence, #4 Exhibit D - Indictment, #5 Exhibit E - Coleman Meth Charge, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Brent J. Savage, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Sheriff Ramsey Bennett, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Octavio Arango, #9 Exhibit I - Beaumier People Search, #10 Exhibit J - Beaumier People Search Blackshear, #11 Exhibit K - Email to Paul Henefeld encl Facebook Message, #12 Exhibit L - Order of Publication, #13 Exhibit M - Notice of Publication and Certificate of the Clerk, #14 Exhibit N - Affidavit of Publication, #15 Exhibit O - SEOS - Beverly Beaumier, #16 Exhibit P - Order - Grants MTD of Defendant, #17 Exhibit Q - Amended Order)(Savage, Brent)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT MONICA BROWN by Monica Brown. (Boyter, Ronald)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO TRANSFER, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Monica Brown. Responses due by 3/30/2021. (Boyter, Ronald)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Kennerly. J. Holder Smith, Jr. has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on March 10, 2021. (edd)
March 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Dismiss due by 3/16/2021. (ca)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendant Brown's #11 Motion for Leave to Refile Motions Previously Filed in State Court Out of Time. Defendant Brown shall file her motion to dismiss within seven days of this Court's Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/9/2021. (ca)
March 8, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3052701, Fee Amount $200. (csr)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File / REFILE MOTIONS PREVIOUSLY FILED IN STATE COURT OUT OF TIME by Monica Brown. Responses due by 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyter, Ronald) Modified on 3/5/2021 (jlh).
March 4, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolutions of the Motions to Dismiss. (MG)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolutions of the Motions to Dismiss by Beverly Beaumier. Responses due by 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery)(Henefeld, Paul)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3052701, Fee Amount $200, by Clinton Wayne Harper. Responses due by 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Smith, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2021: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (slt).
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Holder Smith, Jr on behalf of Clinton Wayne Harper (Smith, John)
March 2, 2021 Duplicate Entry. (slt) Modified on 3/2/2021 (slt).
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by Beverly Beaumier. Responses due by 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Coffee County Complaint, #2 Exhibit Coffee County Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Henefeld, Paul)
March 2, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 First MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Add Raven Golden as a Party Defendant, #6 First MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Join Rachel Aldridge, as the Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Brooklynn Aldridge, as a Party Plaintiff. (MG)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Join Rachel Aldridge, as the Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Brooklynn Aldridge, as a Party Plaintiff by Rachel Aldridge. Responses due by 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Temporary Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Motion to Add Rachel Aldridge, as the Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Brooklynn Aldridge, as a Plaintiff, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Savage, Brent)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Add Raven Golden as a Party Defendant by Rachel Aldridge. Responses due by 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Monica Brown, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Motion to Add Raven Golden as Party Defendant (State Court), #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Savage, Brent)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent J. Savage on behalf of Rachel Aldridge (Savage, Brent)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. Beverly Beaumier answer due 2/23/2021; Monica Brown answer due 2/23/2021. Compliance re Plaintiff's Notice of Appearance and Pro Hac Vice Applications for any attorney not admitted to practice in the SDGA due by 2/26/2021. Re-File any pending Motions by 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Forms) (MG)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 02/16/2021. (MG)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Beverly Beaumier from Superior Court of Pierce County, Georgia, case number SUCA20200000068. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3037553.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaints, Answers-Not all Defendants, All Pleadings from Superior Court- Part 1, #2 Exhibit Complaints, Answers-Not all Defendants, All Pleadings from Superior Court- Part 2, #3 Exhibit Complaints, Answers-Not all Defendants, All Pleadings from Superior Court- Part 3, #4 Exhibit Complaints, Answers-Not all Defendants, All Pleadings from Superior Court- Part 4, #5 Exhibit Complaints, Answers-Not all Defendants, All Pleadings from Superior Court- Part 5, #6 Exhibit Consent to Removal by Defendant Harper, #7 Exhibit Consent to Removal by Defendant Brown, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. Beaumier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Wayne Harper
Represented By: John Holder Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Leslie Kennerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Beaumier
Represented By: Paul A. Henefeld
Represented By: Noah Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Brown
Represented By: Ronald S. Boyter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raven Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Aldridge
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?