Key v. Fugitt et al
Plaintiff: Ramie Key
Defendant: Charles Fugitt and Christopher Kight
Case Number: 6:2014cv00039
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER adopting the 43 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; granting Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Default Judgment; awarding total damages, fees, and costs in the amount of $289,367.59 against Defendant Kight and in favor of Plaintiff, as apportioned and outlined in the body of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/24/2017. (jah)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Plaintiff's 30 MOTION for Default Judgment and AWARD damages, fees, and costs in the amount of $289,367.59 against Defendant Kight and in favor of Plaintiff. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/8/2017. (csr)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Entry of Default. The Clerk is directed to Strike defendant Christopher Kight's answer and enter default against him. The plaintiff is directed to file his motion for default judgment within 30 days of the Clerk's entry of default. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/22/15. (cmr)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing the parties to modify the consent judgment and re-submit for the Court's review within 7 days of this order, (Compliance due by 8/5/2015). Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/29/15. (cmr)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying the 12 Stipulation and request for approval for settlement and entry of consent judgment. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 10/22/14. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key v. Fugitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramie Key
Represented By: David S. Eichholz
Represented By: Albert Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?