November 29, 2016 |
Filing
128
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/29/2016. (thb)
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing
107
ORDER denying 105 Objection. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/26/2016. (thb) Modified on 9/26/2016.
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
101
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 88 Objections re 87 Order. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/24/2016. (thb)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing
100
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion for opinion and expert testimony; granting Defendants' 92 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to provide Defendant any and all expert reports and disclosures required by Fed.R.Ci v.P. 26(a)(2) on or before 9/9/16. Defendant shall provide any and all expert reports and disclosure required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 (a)(2) on or before 9/30/16. Additionally, the Court extends the deadlines for the parties to file motions. The parties s hall file any partially or wholly dispositive motions, and Daubert motions, and any other motion to exclude expert testimony on or before 10/15/16. All other deadlines remain in full force and effect; denying Plaintiff's 93 Motion to Compel; d enying Plaintiff's 96 Motion to Appoint Expert; denying Plaintiff's 98 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 99 Motion for Copies of all Expert Depositions of the Defendant's Expert Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/17/2016. (ca)
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
87
ORDER denying 67 Motion for subpoena; denying 68 Motion for Expert Medical Examiner and Witness Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court hereby extends the deadline for Plaintiff to name and expert witness to 6/30/16, and extends the deadline for Defendant to name an expert witness to 7/15/16. All other deadlines remain unchanged and in full force and effect. Granting 73 Motion to correct spelling error. The Clerk is DIRECTED to chang e Defendant's name on the docket of this case to "Matt Peebles." Denying 74 Motion for Expert Medical Examination by a licensed chiropractor; denying 78 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 79 Motion for production of official files of the GA Dept. of Corrections; denying 81 Motion for production of Georgia Department of Corrections official files; denying 86 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/9/2016. (ca)
|
April 26, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 60 Motion for Copies. The Court overrules Plaintiff's objections, and affirms the Magistrate Judge's March 2, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/26/2016. (thb)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
57
ORDER that the USM to make an reasonable effort to locate Defendant Matt Peeples and to personally serve him with a copy of 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 10 Response to Order, 46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 1 Complaint, 15 Response to Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/2/2016. (ca)
|
February 24, 2016 |
Filing
54
ORDER denying 48 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 49 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/24/2016. (thb)
|
January 12, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide this Court with a proper address for Defendant Peeples so that he can be served with a copy of Plaintiff's complaint within fourteen days of the date of this Order. The Court overrules Plaintiff's object ions and adopts the 19 Report and Recommendation. The Court grants 27 Motion for copies; denies 28 Motion for injunctive relief; dismisses 40 Motion for out of time appeal; dismisses as moot 43 Motion for Status; dismisses as moot [44 ] Motion for Status. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs conspiracy, retaliation, and supervisory liability claims. Also, the Court dismisses April Hodges, Brad Hooks, Stanley Williams, Eyvette Cook, Carl Foust, Debra McCloud, and Nancy Garrett as named Defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Plaintiff with copies of his requested documents at a cost of $0.50 per page, to be charged to Plaintiff's inmate account. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/12/2016. (thb)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Filing
29
ORDER overruling 26 Objection filed by Norman Hampton, III. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/07/2015. (thb)
|