Winberly Jr. v. Broome et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Winberly Jr.
Defendant: Dean Broome, Gail Ferrar and Martha Middleton
Case Number: 6:2015cv00023
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Access to Evidentiary Deposition by Remote Means. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/15/2018. (ca)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING 75 Report and Recommendations, DISMISSES as Moot in Part and DENIES in Part 64 , 68 Motions for Summary Judgment. Specifically, the Court DISMISSES AS MOOT all portions of Defendants' Motions addressing Plaintiff's requests for injunctive relief and DENIES all other portions. Furthermore, given the mootness of Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief, the Court DISMISSES those claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/06/2018. (maa)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS as moot in part and DENY in part Defendants' 64 and 68 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. The Court should DISMISS as moot the portions of Defendants' Motions addressi ng Plaintiff's requests for injunctive relief and DENY all other portions. The Court should also DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendat ion to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2018). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/19/2017. (ca)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER overruling Plaintiff's objections, adopting 53 Report and Recommendations; and denying 49 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/06/2017. (thb)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DENY Defendant Ferra's 49 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objection within fourteen (1 4) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/9/2017. (ca)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that the United States Marshal to make a reasonable effort to locate Defendant Nurse Gail Ferra and to personally serve her with the following: the summons in this case, Plaintiff's Complaint, (doc. 1), Amended Complaint, (doc. 9), and Sec ond Amended Complaint, (doc. 22), as well as this Order, and Documents Numbered 12 and 17. Moreover, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for Service to December 31, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/6/2016. (csr)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting the 30 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; and denying Defendant's 23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/18/2016. (jah)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DENY Defendants Broome and Middleton's 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered t o file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by (6/30/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/16/2016. (csr)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER adopting 24 Report and Recommendations; dismissing 15 Motion to Dismisses as moot and without prejudice. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint remains pending. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/14/16. (cmr)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Plaintiff is ORDERED to file any response in opposition to Defendants' 23 MOTION to Dismiss or to inform the court of his decision not to oppose Defendants' motion within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is hereby instructed to attach a copy of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/19/2016. (csr)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court DISMISS Defendant Broome's 15 MOTION to Dismiss as moot and without prejudice. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fo urteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/29/2016. (csr)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any response in opposition to the Defendant's 15 MOTION for a dismissal or to inform the court of his decision not to oppose Defendant's motion within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is hereby instructed to attach a copy of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/9/2016. (csr)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting the 12 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, as supplemented herein, as the opinion of the Court; and dismissing Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/2/2016. (jah)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the United States Marshal Service to serve a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint upon all Defendants. Generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/9/2015. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winberly Jr. v. Broome et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Winberly Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Broome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Ferrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?