Marshall v. Tatum et al
Plaintiff: Jammie L. Marshall
Defendant: Clay Tatum, Anthony Mobley and Rogers State Prison
Case Number: 6:2015cv00085
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in accordance with the order of this Court entered on 1/18/17. Signed on 1/18/17. (cmr)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER- Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file any response in opposition to the Defendant's 32 MOTION for a dismissal or to inform the court of his decision not to oppose Defendant's motion within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is hereby instructed to attach a copy of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/8/2016. (csr)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion; granting 26 Motion to Amend Complaint; dismissing without prejudice 19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and dismissing as moot 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Respo nse/Reply. The Court hereby ORDERS that the Amended Complaint shall be the operative Complaint in this action. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within twenty-one days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/11/2016. (csr)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART the 10 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and OVERRULES IN PART AND SUSTAINS IN PART Plaintiff's Objections. The Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's recommendation to dismiss all claims against Roge rs State Prison and Defendants in their official capacities. The Court will permit Plaintiff's claims to proceed against Defendant Tatum. The Court DIRECTS the United States Marshal to serve Defendant Tatum with Plaintiff's Complaint, the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, Plaintiff's Objections, and this Order. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Tatum and Mobley in their individual capacities remain pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/14/2016. (csr)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the United States Marshal Service to serve a copy of Complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendant Anthony Mobley. Generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/5/2016. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Tatum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jammie L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?