Shaw v. Upton et al
Plaintiff: Dexter Shaw
Defendant: Steve Upton, Robert Toole, John Paul, Janet Brewton, Roy Sabine, Milton Smith and Lisa Fountain
Case Number: 6:2016cv00006
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 192 . Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/25/2021. (ca)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER ADOPTING re 191 Report and Recommendations. The Court grants Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and denies Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/24/21. (loh)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Overruling re 189 Objection filed by Steve Upton. The October 19, 2020 Order remains the Order of this Court. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/23/20. (cmr)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 113 Motion to be Relieved of Court; denying 122 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. The Court dismisses as premature this portion of Plaintiff's Motion, as no motion for summary judgment is currently pending before the Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/29/2018. (thb)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 60 Report and Recommendations. The Court dismisses without prejudice certain claims. The only claims that remain are Plaintiffs: (1) denial of access to court clai ms against Defendants Fountain, Toole, and Smith; (2) claims that Defendants Upton and Toole retaliated against Plaintiff by placing him on long-term disciplinary segregation; and (3) First Amendmentfree exercise of religion claims against all Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 5/26/17. (cmr)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER overruling 6 objections; concurring with the portions of the 4 Report and Recommendations which have not been vacated. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against Defendant Upton in his official capacity, Plaintif fs claims arising from events occurring in 2010, and Plaintiffs deprivation of property, access to grievance procedures, and due process claims. The Court overrules 24 objections, adopts 23 Report and Recommendations, and dismisses Plaintiff's monetary damages claims under the RLUIPA in their entirety. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/20/2016. (thb)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file any responses in opposition to the Defendants' 25 MOTION to Dismiss or to otherwise inform the court of his decision not to oppose within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/7/2016. (ca)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's monetary damages claims under the Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act ("RLUIPA") 15 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint. However, as stated, Plaintiff's RLUIPA claims for injunctive relief against Defendants will proceed. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2016). The Court VACATES ONLY the portion of the 3/2/16, 4 Report and Recommendations regarding Plaintiff's exhaustion, and enters the following in its stead. Add itionally, given below analysis, I no longer recommend that the Court dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Paul. The remainder of the 3/2/16, Report and Recommendation, except as contradicted herein, remains in full force and effect. ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/15/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Upton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Brewton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Sabine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?