U.S. Energy Sciences, Inc. et al v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Energy Sciences, Inc. and CHAL Holdings, LLC
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2016cv00042
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. This case stands closed. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/10/17. (cmr)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/06/2017. (thb)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/12/2016. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Energy Sciences, Inc. et al v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Energy Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Tina Euginia Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAL Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tina Euginia Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee Gutschenritter
Represented By: R. Scott Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?