The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Bailey et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Sherry Bailey, Sharmon Howard and Kenneth Moon, Jr.
Case Number: 6:2016cv00060
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Clerk's Certificate/ORDER as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt) (wwp)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Deposit Funds. The Clerk is directed to accept the accidental death benefits into the Court's Registry. Prudential's 32 Motion for Clarification and Motion for Preliminary Injunction are denied. Further, the Court grants 40 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Sharmon Howard and Kenneth Moon, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/24/2018. (pts) Modified on 7/24/2018 (wwp).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/29/18. (wwp)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/15/18. (wwp)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDERED that within 14 days of service of this Order, the parties are to submit to the Court their Rule 26(f) report and proposed scheduling order. (Rule 26 Report due by 11/9/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/26/17. (wwp) Modified on 10/26/2017 (wwp).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court ORDERS the Clerk of Court to RELEASE to Prudential all funds it accepted into th e Court's Registry via its Order dated May 26, 2016 (doc. 8). Second, it GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Prudential's interpleader complaint. It GRANTS interpleader with respect to the approximately $332,000.00 of undistributed accid ental death benefits (doc. 25) and DENIES interpleader with respect to the $279,465.70 that Sherry Bailey alleges Prudential unlawfully converted (doc. 25). The Court thus ORDERS SherryBailey, Sharmon Howard, Kenneth Moon, Jr., James Bailey, and Randall Bailey to enter pleadings establishing their adversity to one another and stating their claims to the $332,000.00 of undistributed accidental death funds WITHIN 21 DAYS of thisOrder. Third, it DENIES Prudential's motion to discharg e itfrom the case and enjoin defendants from further legal action(id.). Fourth, it DENIES Prudential's motion for judgment onthe pleadings on all claims (id.). Fifth, it DENIES Prudential's motion for attorneys' fees (id.).Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/29/17. (wwp)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Clerk's Certificate/Order as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (wwp)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/26/2016. (loh)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/25/2016. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Nikole M. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharmon Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Moon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?