McKenzie v. United States of America
Petitioner: Olaudah McKenzie
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2016cv00086
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/2/18. (jrb)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting 11 Report and Recommendations as the opinion of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/7/17. (slt)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 12 Motion for copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/27/17. (wwp)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER unsealing pleadings in Criminal Case 6:15cr-001. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/6/17. (jrb)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER vacating 3 Report and Recommendations. The Court directs respondent to file an answer by 8/12/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/12/16. (wwp)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to submit the Clerk to submit the 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with any objections to the Honorable Lisa Wood on 7/26/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/11/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olaudah McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?