The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. v. Sock et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Defendant: John Gunde Sock, Etta Wilcia Boss-Cole, Anna Claxton, Amos Financial, LLC and The United States
Case Number: 6:2016cv00165
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Toombs
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. This case stands closed. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/22/2018. (jlh)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting the request in Plaintiff's 25 Response to Order for fourteen additional days to file a Motion for Default by 10/18/2018. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/04/2018. (jlh)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment and Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/13/2018. (jlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. v. Sock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Paul G. Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gunde Sock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etta Wilcia Boss-Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Claxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amos Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?