Booker v. Ervin et al
Plaintiff: |
Jarvis Demon Booker |
Defendant: |
Ervin, Sgt. Williams and Sgt Blakely |
Case Number: |
6:2017cv00015 |
Filed: |
January 18, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Statesboro Office |
County: |
Tattnall |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Stan Baker |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 4, 2019 |
Filing
58
JUDGMENT in favor of Ervin against Jarvis Demon Booker. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/04/2019. (jlh)
|
November 13, 2019 |
Filing
46
ORDER regarding jury instructions for the hearing scheduled on Monday, November 18, 2019. To the extent that either party has any objections or suggested charge to these instructions, that party shall raise the objection at the pretrial conference on Friday, November 15, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/13/2019. (jlh)
|
November 12, 2019 |
Filing
44
ORDER setting this case for a jury trial on November 18, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Statesboro, Georgia. If Plaintiff wishes to have witnesses subpoenaed to appear, he must follow the procedures outlined in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/12/2019. (jlh) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jlh).
|
September 9, 2019 |
Filing
38
ORDER directing lead counsel for the parties to file a joint consolidated proposed pretrial order. (Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2019.) Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2019 11:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hal l; Jury Selection set for 11/18/2019 09:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall; Jury Trial set for 11/18/2019 09:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. Lead counsel for each party shall attend the pretrial conference. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/09/2019. (jlh)
|
March 29, 2019 |
Filing
36
ORDER ADOPTING the 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion. The Court grants Defendants' unopposed 32 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismisses all claims against Defendants Williams and Blakely in their entirety and Plai ntiff's claims for compensatory and punitive damages against Defendant Ervin. Plaintiff's excessive force claims for nominal damages against Defendant Ervin shall remain pending. The Court denies Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis as to his dismissed claims. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/29/2019. (jlh)
|
March 7, 2019 |
Filing
35
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendants' unopposed 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment and allow Plaintiff to proceed only on his excessive force claim against Defendant Ervin for nominal damages. Any par ty seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 3/21/2019). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/7/2019. (csr)
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing
21
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSES Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against Defendants in their official capacities. However, Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force and deliberate indifference to medical needs claims shall proceed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/08/17. (jlm)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
10
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against Defendants in their official capacity re 1 Complaint. Plaintiff states colorable Eight Amendment excessive force and deliber ate indifference claims against Defendants, and those claims should proceed. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/12/2017. (ca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?