LYONS v. DUGUSKI et al
Plaintiff: |
JANEY M LYONS |
Defendant: |
COURTNEY DUGUSKI, SERCOYER REID WILSON and BATTIE |
Case Number: |
6:2017cv00063 |
Filed: |
May 5, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Statesboro Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Stan Baker |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 9, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER ADOPTING 25 Report and Recommendations; DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint, as amended, for failure to state a claim; DENYING Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal; and CLOSING this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/09/2018. (maa)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
25
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's 20 Amended Complaint, for failure to state a claim, DIRECT the Clerk to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case, and DENY Plaint iff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Court ORDERS that any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2018). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/9/2018. (ca)
|
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
21
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's 1 Complaint without prejudice, DIRECT the Clerk to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and CLOSE this case, and DENY Plaintiff leave to appeal in fo rma pauperis. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/27/2017. (ca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?